DE HB353 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of this Act clarifies that the intent of Senate Bill No. 32 of the 149th General Assembly was to require mortgagees to file a statement of mortgagee address change when its notice address changed, not to require mortgagees to include each mortgage affected by a change of notice address.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mortgages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-28 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |