DE HB351 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act serves to codify numerous policies that promote the autonomy of the Alderman’s Court and thereby foster public confidence in the Court. The Act describes the processes of nomination, appointment by the Governor, and confirmation by the Senate. Pursuant to this Act, many of the policies applicable to the Magistrate’s Court are applied to Alderman’s Court, such as requirements to segregate the Court from the Town’s offices. It also codifies standards relating to vacancies, qualifications, duties, and jurisdiction.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Newark Relating To The Alderman.
Sponsors
Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. Teresa Schooley [D] |
Sen. Liane Sorenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-26 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-13 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2012-06-12 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-12 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-06-12 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 Favorable | |
2012-05-17 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |