DE HB350 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a special license plate for Suicide Prevention, Awareness, and Support in honor of Jason Staley.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-12 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2022-04-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |