DE HB347 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health, Children & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act strengthens the role and responsibilities of the Provider Advisory Board in regard to the implementation and enforcement of The Delaware Child Care Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Provider Advisory Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2018-06-19 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-06-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 347 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-12 Amendment HA 1 to HB 347 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-03-20 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback