DE HB341 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The act exempts from the Delaware Tax on the lease of motion picture films a broad number of not-for profit organizations exempt from income tax under the Internal Revenue Code, such as the Rehoboth Film Festival.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Use Tax On Leases Of Tangible Personal Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-28 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-06-13 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2012-06-07 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2012-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |