DE HB34 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
House Bill No. 34 requires school boards, including charter schools, to permit public comment on each agenda item presented for a vote at a school board meeting. The public comment period must take place before the school board vote on an agenda item. The school board may reasonably restrict the time, place, and manner of the public comment period.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-03-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2023-01-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2023-01-18 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2023-01-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2023-01-17 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 34, and Assigned to Education Committee in House |