DE HB329 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill eliminates the prohibition against the mere possession of a body-gripping trap with a jaw spread in excess of 5 inches, while maintaining the prohibition against actually using one in Delaware. This modification is necessary because many licensed Delaware trappers legally trap in other states where such traps are legal and it also allows trap collectors to possess the larger traps while maintaining the prohibition against their actual use.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulations And Prohibitions Concerning Game And Fish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |