DE HB326 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates the Delaware Advance Scholarship Program (Program). The goal of this Act is to encourage Delaware students with intellectual disabilities to pursue studies for a comprehensive certificate or degree at a Delaware institution of higher education in order to promote economic self-sufficiency. This will result in an economic benefit to the State in the form of a more diverse, well-prepared workforce that is less reliant on government support. This Act follows the Higher Education Opportunities Act of 2008, which authorizes comprehensive transition and post-secondary programs as a pathway to higher education for students with intellectual disabilities. The Program will be effective beginning in the 2018 through 2019 academic year.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Advance Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-29 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-04-26 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 326 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-04-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 326 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-03-29 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 326 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 326 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |