DE HB323 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires that annual or biennial reports published by various public bodies of the Executive Branch of State Government be posted in a central online repository available to the citizens through the State’s web portal. By creating a single, central database for these reports by public bodies, this Act will significantly improve citizen access to public information that may be difficult to locate. Additionally, in lieu of the costly and time consuming task of publishing, printing, and mailing each report, this Act provides that a public body’s duty to publish and provide these reports to others in state government is met by providing electronic notification of the availability of these reports on a designated website.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-05-06 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |