DE HB322 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill removes the requirement that the Director of the Office of Management and Budget approve Title 18-related refunds of overpayments.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Processing Of Refunds Of Overpayments.
Sponsors
Rep. William Bush [D] | Sen. Spiros Mantzavinos [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. David Lawson [R] |
Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-05-04 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-03-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-10 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2022-03-10 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |