DE HB322 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill lowers the mayoral age requirement from 30 to 25. This change makes the Mayors age requirement consistent with that for City Councilmen. Under the City s Charter, if the Mayor resigns, dies or is unable to perform his/her duties, the Council President takes the Mayors place. This succession would prove problematic if the Council President does not meet the age requirement for Mayor.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Wilmington Relating To Qualifications For Mayor.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-08 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |