DE HB31 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill defines Street Rods to correspond with the same age requirement as used for antique motor vehicles, and would remove a fender requirement. Historically Street Rods are open-wheeled vehicles.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Street Rods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-01-25 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2019-01-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-01-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 Favorable | |
2019-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |