DE HB301 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act allows the various at-large members of the Domestic Violence Coordinating Council to be appointed for 3-year terms and be eligible for reappointment. This change is requested by the Council.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Domestic Violence Coordinating Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-03 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-04-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 301 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-04-25 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 301 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-28 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-03-27 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 301 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-03-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 301 - Stricken in House | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 301 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-01-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |