DE HB300 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-16 - Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill enhances Delaware’s Freedom of Information Act by setting a deadline when public bodies must respond to a Freedom of Information Request.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-20 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2009-12-10 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |