DE HB297 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill confirms existing statutes and practices related to the administration of the corporation franchise tax.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 8 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware General Corporation Law.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. George [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-01-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-01-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-20 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-14 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2010-01-14 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2010-01-14 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-01-13 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-01-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |