DE HB294 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Section 1 of this Act transfers from the Department of Safety and Homeland Security to the Department of Health and Social Services the responsibility for establishing, administering, adopting rules and regulations, and setting fees for courses of instruction and programs of rehabilitation for those whose licenses have been revoked for driving a vehicle under the influence of alcohol or any drug, or both. The Department of Health and Social Services Division of Substance Abuse and Mental Health is better positioned to establish and operate programs aimed at treating substance abuse issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Driving Under The Influence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 NO
2018-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-27 Amendment HA 2 to HB 294 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HB 294 - Stricken in House
2018-06-27 Amendment HA 2 to HB 294 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 1 to HB 294 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2018-01-09 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback