DE HB291 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies that the representative appointed by the Secretary of the Department of Health and Social Services to the Human Trafficking Interagency Coordinating Council shall serve as the Councils temporary chair for the purposes of organizing the initial meeting of the members. A permanent Chair and Vice Chair are to be elected at the first organizational meeting and shall be elected annually thereafter from among the members of the Council.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Human Trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-01-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-01-17 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-01-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-01-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-01-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |