DE HB287 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill establishes a set prevailing wage rate and eliminates the need for a survey based upon certain requirements.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Prevailing Wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 4 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 3 defeated |
2014-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Stricken |
2014-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 4 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2014-05-06 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-05-06 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-04-10 | House | Re-Assigned to Labor Committee in House |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |