DE HB272 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows the Family Court to exercise jurisdiction over parties married to each other who own jointly titled real property which may have been acquired prior to their marriage and not in contemplation of marriage.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Family Court Jurisdiction And Powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |