DE HB272 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill modifies the residence requirement of the Chief Investigative Services Officer from a county residency requirement to a state residency requirement. Chief Investigative Services Officers are required to perform statewide services. Many state employees work in one county but live in another. A county residency requirement can prevent qualified investigative services officers or other applicants from applying for the position of Chief Investigative Services Officer or require a well performing Chief Investigative Services Officer to be demoted if he or she decides that it is in his or her best interest to move to another county.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Investigative Services Officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Bennett [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. George Bunting [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] |
Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-20 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |