DE HB251 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act eliminates the $100,000 business license fee for firms engaged in crude oil lightering. It consequently eliminates the designation of proceeds from the lightering license fee to the Hazardous Substance Cleanup Fund.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 7 And 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Occupational Licenses And Fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-20 | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-15 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in House |