DE HB247 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill removes the 3 year sunset provision that was part of House Bill No. 53, as amended, enacted on May 10, 2018 of the 149th General Assembly. This will allow the on-going use of certain ground-based and hand-held sparklers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 242, Volume 81 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Selling Or Possessing Fireworks; Exceptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 NO
2019-07-01 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2019-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2019-06-25 Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback