DE HB247 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill sets forth revisions to the composition of the Council on Services for Aging and Adults with Physical Disabilities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Council On Services For Aging And Adults With Physical Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-01-25 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-01-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-01-23 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 247 - Stricken in Senate | |
2018-01-23 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 247 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-07-12 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |