DE HB238 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enables licensed veterinarians to exempt an animal from the mandated rabies vaccination, if the veterinarian determines the vaccine would endanger the animals health and a titer test has been administered to assist in determining the necessity of the vaccine. Additionally the bill requires that a license veterinarian complete a Vaccine Risk Assessment Form provided by the department and to review the form with the pet owner. The form must be developed and distributed to licensed veterinarians by the Department of Health and Social Services before January 1, 2019.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Rabies And Other Vaccination Requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Tabled in Committee | |
2018-04-24 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 238 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |