DE HB228 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows Sussex County, by duly enacted ordinance, to impose a local lodging tax of no more than 3 percent of rent on rooms in a hotel, motel or tourist home located in the unincorporated areas of the County. Such funds may only be used in Sussex County for the capital and operating costs of beach nourishment, waterway dredging, economic development, tourism programs, recreational activities, and water quality and flood control projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17 Signed by Governor
2019-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2019-07-01 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2019-06-21 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2019-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 ABSENT
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-17 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback