DE HB227 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds child abuse in the third degree to the list of enumerated criminal offenses for which, if convicted, one is by definition considered a perpetrator of domestic violence for purposes of this Child Protection From Domestic Violence Act. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Protection From Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Krista Griffith [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-22 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |