DE HB225 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act will restore 11 Del. C. 1448(e)(2) to its place in Delaware’s Criminal Code. The paragraph was inadvertently repealed in 2013.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Use Of A Firearm By Persons Previously Convicted Of A Violent Felony.
Sponsors
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] |
Rep. Donald Blakey [R] | Rep. William Outten [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-01-16 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 7 Favorable |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |