DE HB213 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes the requirements for security guards, private investigator licenses by (a) making the qualifications uniform for both occupations; (b) providing that a license may still be issued for persons convicted of 2 or less of certain misdemeanors, so long as the misdemeanors are more than 7 years old; and (c) disqualifying juveniles adjudicated delinquent of a felony level offense unless they are at least 21 years old. The bill also provides for uniformity across all the licensees in Chapter 13 of Title 24.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Private Investigators And Private Security Agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Rep. Stephen Smyk [R] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. James Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 8 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-06-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |