DE HB212 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-29 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 22 YES 19 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-29 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 22 YES 19 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the State’s alcoholic beverage tax rates. The rate for beer increases by 2 per 12 ounce can. The rate for wine increases by 3 per 5 ounce serving. The rate for spirits containing more than 25% ethyl alcohol by volume increases by 15 per 750 ml bottle.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 5, Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taxes On Alcoholic Beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Cook [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
Sen. Gary Simpson [R] | Sen. Liane Sorenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 22 YES 19 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Lifted from Table in House | |
2009-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-25 | Laid On Table in House | |
2009-06-25 | Restored in House | |
2009-06-18 | Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 23 YES 17 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment HA 1 defeated | |
2009-06-16 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-06-10 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 4 On Its Merits, 3 Unfavorable | |
2009-06-09 | Introduced in House and assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-06-09 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |