DE HB206 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill will add 4 new check-off donation boxes on the Delaware personal income tax return whereby individuals may choose to donate a portion of their tax refund, or designate an amount in addition to the tax they owe that will be transferred by the Division of Revenue to one of the following organizations: Food Bank of Delaware, Sussex County Habitat for Humanity, Central Delaware Habitat for Humanity, or Habitat for Humanity of New Castle County.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Income Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 13 On Its Merits |
2015-06-23 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |