DE HB201 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies that after a physician-patient relationship has been properly established in accordance with this section, subsequent communications and treatment may be conducted as the doctor and patient deem appropriate. As with all practice of medicine, such subsequent interactions must still meet the standard of care for the given field of medicine.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Telemedicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |