DE HB195 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill creates the crime of unlawful use of an unmanned aircraft system. The bill prohibits unmanned aircraft systems from flying over sporting events, concerts, automobile races, festivals, and events at which more than 5000 people are in attendance and critical infrastructure in the State of Delaware. The penalty for the crime is an unclassified misdemeanor for a first offense and a class A misdemeanor for a second or subsequent offense unless injury occurs to a person or property damage occurs as a result of a violation in which case it is a Class G. Felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unmanned Aircraft Systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-06SenateSigned by Governor
2016-07-01HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01SenateRoll Call Rescinded in Senate
2016-07-01SenateDefeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 13 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01SenateAmendment SA 4 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01SenateAmendment SA 3 - Stricken
2016-07-01SenateAmendment SA 2 - Stricken
2016-07-01SenateAmendment SA 1 - Stricken
2016-06-29SenateAmendment SA 4 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2016-06-21SenateReported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2016-05-12SenateAmendment SA 3 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2015-06-25SenateAmendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2015-06-24SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2015-06-23SenateAssigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate
2015-06-23HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2015-06-23HouseAmendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
2015-06-23HouseAmendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
2015-06-17HouseReported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2015-06-16HouseIntroduced in House and assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee
2015-06-16HouseAssigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback