DE HB194 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Legislation aligns the penalty for non-compliance with the non-nurse midwives law and regulations with the penalty for practicing medicine without a license. It imposes civil and/or criminal penalties for violations of existing law. The increase in penalties is necessary because people are acting in violation of current law and regulations and as such are exposing mothers and newborn infants to significant risk and harm.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Health And Social Services And Midwifery.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Walker [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 4 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-25 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2013-06-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2013-06-18 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |