DE HB193 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill seeks to provide the State Fire Commission with the authority to hear and resolve disputes filed by members of the public or fire companies with respect to firefighting activities by individual firefighters and fire companies. The Commission may utilize existing regulations to hear such disputes or many promulgate additional regulations consistent and in furtherance of this subsection. This bill also authorizes the Commission and its staff to investigate fires where firefighters are injured and to issue investigative reports detailing findings and conclusions. Finally, the bill provides immunity to the Commission and its staff for activity authorized by this section.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Jurisdiction Of The Delaware State Fire Prevention Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 193 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 193 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-12 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 5 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2022-05-12 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 193 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-05-12 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 193 - Stricken in House | |
2022-05-12 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 193 - Stricken in House | |
2022-05-12 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 193 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-05-11 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 193 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 193 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-08 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-05-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |