DE HB193 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act authorizes teacher candidates who will participate in the alternative routes for teacher licensure and certification program hired after July 1 of a school year to fulfill the 120 hour seminar/practicum requirement prior to the start of the following school year.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educator Licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-20 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 14 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |