DE HB192 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This act establishes that municipal governments may pass ordinances regulating the possession of firearms, ammunition, components of firearms, and explosives in municipal buildings and police stations subject to specific requirements. The act further allows municipalities to establish penalties for violation by ordinance.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Possession Of Firearms, Ammunition, And Explosives In Municipal Buildings And Police Stations By Non-licensed Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 3 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 22 YES 14 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |