DE HB187 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
With the implementation of land banks in the State of Delaware, an increasing number of vacant and abandoned properties will be brought to sheriffs sales. Many of these parcels will be dilapidated and require investment to render the house habitable. Blight will only be ameliorated if the bidders upon such property acquire it intending to invest in the property, thereby improving the housing in the neighborhood and eliminating blight. If bidders at a tax lien sale have failed to pay taxes when due and have failed to maintain the condition of other real property they own in the same jurisdiction, it is not likely that they intend to invest in and improve the condition of additional property they acquire. Instead they are speculating on a turnaround in the neighborhood based upon the investment and efforts of others.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 9 And 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Sheriff's Sales.
Sponsors
Rep. James Johnson [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2017-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 187 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 187 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-21 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 187 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 187 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |