DE HB18 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 14 Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]

Summary

This Act makes all veterans with a minimum discharge of general discharge under honorable conditions eligible for assistance from the Delaware Veterans Trust Fund, effective January 1, 2020. This Act also directs 3% of the proceeds returned to the State from the proceeds of charitable video lottery machines operated by veterans organizations to the Delaware Veterans Trust Fund, effective July 1, 2019, so that there are sufficient funds to assist the expanded number of individuals who will be eligible for assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Directing The Proceeds From Charitable Video Lottery Machines To And Changing The Eligibility For The Delaware Veterans Trust Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 14 Favorable
2019-01-17 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 18, and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback