DE HB174 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes standards for data security for Title 18 licensees and standards for the investigation of and notification to the Commissioner of a cybersecurity event affecting Title 18 licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Insurance Data Security Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31 Signed by Governor
2019-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-19 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-13 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2019-06-13 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits
2019-06-03 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback