DE HB161 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds an additional classification for surgical hospitals. House Bill No. 91 adopted by the 150th General Assembly (82 Del. Laws c. 73) revised the statutory definition of hospital and classified hospitals as either General, Long-term care, Psychiatric, or Rehabilitation. The existing classifications do not include surgical hospitals, those specialized hospitals providing surgical services at a level of care higher than freestanding surgery centers but whose patients do not require all of the services provided by General acute care hospitals. This Act will allow the Department of Health and Social Services to license and regulate surgical hospitals providing inpatient and outpatient surgical services to patients whose duration of stay is not expected to exceed 72 hours.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Definition Of Hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-20 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2021-05-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-05-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 161 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 6 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-07 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 161 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-04-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |