DE HB158 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill transfers the placement of the Cash Management Policy Board from within the Department of Finance to the Office of the State Treasurer and provides that support for the Board shall be determined by the State Treasurer as is currently done.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Cash Management Policy Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-08 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2023-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2023-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2023-05-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |