DE HB156 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes the comprehensive framework for the regulation of pet insurance transacted in Delaware. The Act reflects the adoption of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners Pet Insurance Model Act, with adjustments made to conform the model act to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual, including using the singular tense of a word rather than the plural tense.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pet Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-15 | Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate | |
2023-06-15 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2023-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2023-05-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |