DE HB148 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on July 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would direct the Office of the State Treasurer to add a Roth option to state sponsored 403(b) and 457(b) savings plans that are offered to eligible teachers and state employees. This bill would not require the state to contribute any additional funds into the retirement plans. The Roth option has been proven to be a more tax-friendly way to save for most individual investors than the traditional, non-Roth, tax-deferred method of saving that is currently offered in state sponsored retirement plans. The change is a simple administrative change. The majority of states have already moved forward to add the Roth option to their plans. It only seems fitting that the state that was so honorably served by William V. Roth, Jr. should offer a Roth option to its employees.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Retirement Plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |
2013-06-11 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-11 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-06-11 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-05-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |