DE HB135 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation would permit the Board to grant a limited license to a Director or Chairperson of a hospital dental or oral and maxillofacial surgery department and its associated residency programs, who would be permitted to train and teach future practitioners in dentistry or oral and maxillofacial surgery. At the current time, Delaware has a nationally recognized residency program in these fields. This legislation will enable Delaware hospitals to attract nationally recognized and uniquely qualified dentists to chair or direct these residency training programs. The limited license will permit the licensee to practice dentistry or oral and maxillofacial surgery only in the hospital or an associated institution.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Related To The Issuance Of A Limited License For A Director Or Chairperson Of A Dental Or Oral And Maxillofacial Surgery Residency Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-18 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-11 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-11 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-04 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-03 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-04-29 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |