DE HB134 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 establishes the Towns authority to enact the laws of the Town, its ability to sue and be sued, and its perpetual succession.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Hartly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-13 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2021-05-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-05-13 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2021-04-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-30 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 134, and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |