DE HB134 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act changes the term of a school board member from 5 years to 3 years and adds the requirement that each school board member is paid $100 per meeting attended by the Department of Education
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Rep. John Viola [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 134 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 134 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 14 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |