DE HB134 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act removes incarceration as a possible sentence for certain less serious offenses in chapters 41 and 42 of the Motor Vehicle Code including Following Too Closely ( 4123), Unlawful Use of a Controlled-Access Highway ( 4126), Speeding ( 4169), Careless or Inattentive Driving ( 4176), and for offenses for which penalties are not specified as part of the statute ( 4205) (which would include Failure to Stop at a Stop Sign ( 4164)). The courts will still be able to impose incarceration, when warranted, in the more serious chapter 41 traffic offenses, such as Overtaking and Passing a School Bus, Reckless Driving, Aggressive Driving, Operation of a Vehicle Causing Death, and Driving Under the Influence. The Act also lowers the maximum penalties for each of the provisions other than Speeding. According to data from the first half of 2008, there were nearly 6,000 convictions for Following Too Closely, Unlawful Use of a Controlled Access Highway, and Careless or Inattentive Driving, and no fine greater than $50 was imposed in any of the nearly 6,000 cases.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Penalties For Certain Motor Vehicle Offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. John Atkins [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Rep. George [?] | Rep. James Johnson [D] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Liane Sorenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-06-08 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2011-06-07 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-01 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2011-05-26 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |