DE HB131 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill reduces the required number of meetings that the Advisory Council on Video Lottery Planning and the Advisory Council on Charitable Gaming Planning must hold each calendar year and authorizes the Lottery Director to add certain sports lottery players to an involuntary exclusion list by order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Lotteries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2019-05-15 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2019-05-14 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2019-05-08 Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2019-05-02 Introduced and Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback