DE HB13 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides Statewide consistency in the law that protects the public from dangerous dogs and clarifies that dogs may not be held potentially dangerous or dangerous for animal control enforcement or for purposes of criminal liability based solely on breed-specific criteria. Findings to deem a dog dangerous will be based on actions of the dog, or an individualized demonstration of vicious behavior. It also prohibits municipalities from enacting breed-specific ordinances or regulations. The bill deletes outdated references to the now-defunct Dog Control Panel and replaces them with reference to the Justice of the Peace Court procedure laid out in Chapter 30F of Title 16.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 11, 16, And 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Dogs.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Kimberly Williams [D] |
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-04-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-28 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-03-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 30 YES 10 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-03-23 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 13 - Defeated By House. Votes: 16 YES 24 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-03-23 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 13 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-03-23 | Roll Call Rescinded in House | |
2017-03-23 | Restored in House | |
2017-03-21 | Defeated By House. Votes: 25 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT | |
2017-03-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2016-12-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |