DE HB128 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill modernizes the language of the statute to conform to the current practice of the Court.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Habitual Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits |
2013-05-09 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |